Sims v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Brenda Sims
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00025
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Brenda Sims. (Goralewicz, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Docket Annotation: Please disregard Doc. #8 JOINT STATUS REPORT from the docket as it was filed erroneously by counsel. (nv)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Brenda Sims. . (Goralewicz, Richard) Modified on 2/26/2019 to correct docket text (nv).
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Brenda Sims. (Goralewicz, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2019 @ 09:40 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 2/25/2019. (cla)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by John Hancock Life Insurance Company.(Pebsworth, James)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard J Goralewicz on behalf of Brenda Sims (Goralewicz, Richard)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Mia Vahlberg on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (Vahlberg, Mia)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by James Wesley Pebsworth on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (Pebsworth, James)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 ENTER ORDER directing counsel for the parties to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 01/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 01/14/2019. (lam)
January 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2844771. (Pebsworth, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2018-1238 filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition for Declaratory Relief, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Errata and Amendment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amended Petition, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hancock Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mia Vahlberg
Represented By: James Wesley Pebsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sims
Represented By: Melissa A Brooks
Represented By: Richard J Goralewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?