Poe v. Bemis Company Inc

Plaintiff: Alyssa Poe
Defendant: Bemis Company Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00027
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bemis Company Inc answer due 3/21/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/6/19. (jw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bemis Company Inc. (Tubb, J)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bemis Company Inc answer due 3/7/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/5/19. (jw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Summons Issued or Otherwise Plead by Thirty (30) Days by Bemis Company Inc. (Tubb, J)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandi M Haskins on behalf of Bemis Company Inc (Haskins, Brandi)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S Panach on behalf of Bemis Company Inc (Panach, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by J Jeremy Tubb on behalf of Bemis Company Inc (Tubb, J)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa Poe. Bemis Company Inc served on 1/15/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Alyssa Poe (Haupt, Shannon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Alyssa Poe (Leonard, Jana)
January 14, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2845688. (Leonard, Jana)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bemis Company Inc. (nv)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bemis Company Inc filed by Alyssa Poe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poe v. Bemis Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Company Inc
Represented By: J Jeremy Tubb
Represented By: Brandi M Haskins
Represented By: Matthew S Panach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Poe
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?