Frederick v. Carpenter
Petitioner: Darrell Wayne Frederick
Respondent: Mike Carpenter
Case Number: 5:2019cv00037
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell: Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2019. (cps)
February 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Please see Order for further details. This Order disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/21/2019. (cps)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 GENERAL ORDER 16-04 and CONSENT FORM: Each party must file the attached consent form within 30 days of this notice, either consenting or not consenting. Pursuant to General Order 16-4, you must complete and file this form no later than March 22, 2019. (cps)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer J Dickson on behalf of Mike Carpenter (Dickson, Jennifer)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Meghan J LeFrancois on behalf of Darrell Wayne Frederick (LeFrancois, Meghan)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Case Management/Budget Litigation Conf set for set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/15/2019. (cps)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Emma V Rolls on behalf of Darrell Wayne Frederick (Rolls, Emma)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel.Please see order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/15/2019. (cps)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in light of the receipt of the payment of the filing fee. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/15/2019. (md)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 1/15/2019. (md)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from Darrell Wayne Frederick in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500071814 regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ac)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Darrell Wayne Frederick. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment 1 Brief, #2 Attachment Attachment 2 Original Application for Post Conviction Relief in a Death Penalty Case, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darrell Wayne Frederick. (ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick v. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Wayne Frederick
Represented By: Meghan J LeFrancois
Represented By: Emma V Rolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Carpenter
Represented By: Jennifer J Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?