Nazinitsky v. Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc

Plaintiff: Allison Nazinitsky
Defendant: Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00043
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief In Support filed by Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc. (Albert, Victor)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief In Support filed by Allison Nazinitsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, T)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by T Matthew Smith on behalf of Allison Nazinitsky (Smith, T)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc . (Albert, Victor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief In Support by Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge)(Albert, Victor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Victor F Albert on behalf of Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc (Albert, Victor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren C Oldham on behalf of Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc (Oldham, Lauren)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Rand C Eddy on behalf of Allison Nazinitsky (Eddy, Rand)
January 16, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2847683. (Eddy, Rand)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc. (nv)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc filed by Allison Nazinitsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazinitsky v. Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integris Baptist Medical Center Inc
Represented By: Victor F Albert
Represented By: Lauren C Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Nazinitsky
Represented By: Rand C Eddy
Represented By: T Matthew Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?