Hubbard et al v. Omega Security Specialists Inc et al

Plaintiff: Olivia Hubbard
Defendant: Daniel Kevin Herd and Omega Security Specialists Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00046
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs PLT's Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice (McIntyre, Noble)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omega Security Specialists Inc. Omega Security Specialists Inc served on 1/29/2019. (Alexander, William)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Kevin Herd. Daniel Kevin Herd served on 1/29/2019. (Alexander, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble)
January 17, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2848379. (McIntyre, Noble)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel Kevin Herd and Omega Security Specialists Inc. (nv)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Kevin Herd, Omega Security Specialists Inc filed by Olivia Hubbard(Individually), Olivia Hubbard(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Wage Claim for Olivia Hubbard, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard et al v. Omega Security Specialists Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kevin Herd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Security Specialists Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Hubbard
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?