Conner v. Oklahoma State of et al

Plaintiff: Charles M Conner, III
Defendant: The City of Kingston Oklahoma, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Oklahoma State of, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Wanda Pearce, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Craig Ladd, Jack Wallace Coppedge, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor and Danny Cryer
Case Number: 5:2019cv00047
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
0 Judge: Charles Goodwin
1 Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike all Motions Made By All Defendants and Compel Court For Ruling by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Brief and Support of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2-Due Process the Defendants do not Meet Requirements for Relief, #3 Exhibit 3-Motion Strike All Defendants Motions to Dismss Motion to Compel For Default Judgment Motion Court to find Counsel Stefanie Lawson and Jessica Dark in Contempt, #4 Exhibit 4-State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5-Conclusions and Motions)(ac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Brief in Support of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2-Due Process, #3 Exhibit 3-Plaintiff Meets Requirments and is so Entitled to Default Judgment As A Matter of Law, #4 Exhibit 4-Plaintiff Meets Requirments and is so Entitled to Default Judgment As A Matter of Law, #5 Exhibit 5-Plaintiff Proves Entitlement to Default Judgement, #6 Exhibit 6-State Court Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7-Conclusion and Motions)(ac)
February 22, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay Case by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment String Cheese Incident, LLC v. Stylus Shows, Inc., Unpublished Case)(Lawson, Stefanie)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #41 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/22/2019. (md)
February 21, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #50 Response, by The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 21, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #25 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support filed by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE re #44 Reply to Response to Motion, #43 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Victims of Crime, #2 Exhibit 2- Definitions for the Defendants the City of Kingston, #3 Exhibit 3- Definitions, #4 Exhibit 4- Definitions, #5 Exhibit 5- Definitions, #6 Exhibit 6- Conclusions)(rb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Compel for Default Judgement, Motion to Compel to set Case for Trial, and Motion to Strike and Deny All Motions for All Defendants. by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Exhibits A-U, #2 Exhibit 2- Definitions Part 1, #3 Exhibit 3- Definitions Part 2, #4 Affidavit)(rb)
February 18, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Order filed by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Ashlock, Justin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Order filed by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Ashlock, Justin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Hearing filed by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Ashlock, Justin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall J Wood on behalf of The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma (Wood, Randall)
February 18, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 18, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Kingston Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 15, 2019 Filing 42 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert S Lafferrandre on behalf of The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma (Lafferrandre, Robert)
February 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1Miller Dollarhide vs Moshe, #2 Exhibit 2-Supreme Court clarifies correct standard for recusal of judge, #3 Exhibit 3-Tigges v Andrews, #4 Exhibit 4-Attachment, #5 Exhibit 5-Ohio case no 16-cv-3058, #6 Exhibit Affidavit)(ac)
February 14, 2019 Filing 40 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles Goodwin no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/14/2019. (jb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Order, #29 MOTION for Order filed by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 14, 2019 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS re #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Order /Motion for Remand filed by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 13, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Order by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Document List, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons Process, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice)(rb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Order filed by The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Order by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Motion)(kmt)
February 12, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Order filed by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Ashlock, Justin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Oklahoma State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Oklahoma County Docket Sheet printed 2.11.19, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Mailing Summons and Complaint to Defendant Coppedge)(Lawson, Stefanie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Dismiss , #22 MOTION to Dismiss , #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #26 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support, #21 MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support filed by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cases Involving Covert Organized Stalking and Torture)(kmt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Order titled "Motion for Order of Default Judgment Against the City of Kingston and Kingston Police Department and Brief in Support" by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit 2 - Beall v Munson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Guidelines for Obtaining Default Judgment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Definition of Due Process Clause)(kmt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Order titled "Motion for Order of Default Judgment Against the State of Oklahoma, OSBI, OBN, OAGs Office, Jack Coppedge, Aaron Tabor, Craig Ladd and Brief in Support." by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - False Statements, #2 Exhibit 2 - Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Beall v Munson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Guidelines for Obtaining a Default Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Definition of Due Process Clause)(kmt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Kingston Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support by Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss And Brief in Support by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #12 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading out of Time filed by Jack Wallace Coppedge, #11 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading out of Time filed by Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Aaron Tabor, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Oklahoma State of, and #23 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Construed as a Motion for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading Out of Time); denying #9 MOTION for Order filed by Charles M Conner, III and #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Charles M Conner, III; and striking #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Kingston Oklahoma and #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2019.Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 2/7/19. (kmt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by The City of Kingston Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica) STRICKEN on 2/7/2019 (kmt).
February 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma. (Dark, Jessica) STRICKEN on 2/7/2019 (kmt).
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE (other) by The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma of Consent to Removal (Dark, Jessica)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica L Dark on behalf of The City of Kingston Oklahoma, The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma (Dark, Jessica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Oklahoma State of, Aaron Tabor (Lawson, Stefanie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel titled "Motion to Compel for Default Judgment" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Deny, Quash and Objection to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Response Pleading Out of Time. Plaintiff Respectfully Moves to Compel Court to Grant the Plaintiff Judgment by Default" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Order by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Hale v. Independent School Dist)(Ashlock, Justin)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading out of Time by Jack Wallace Coppedge. (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading out of Time by Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Oklahoma State of, Aaron Tabor. (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order titled "Motion for Jury Trial, Motion to Quash and Deny Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Further Amendment to Plaintiffs Petition and Case Law, Decisions and Brief in Support of the Plaintiff" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Order titled "Affidavit and Motion to Compel Court to Rule in Default Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff Against the Following Defendants - The City of Kingston and Kingston Police Department, the State of Oklahoma, OAG, OSBI, OBN, Craig Ladd, Jack Coppedge, Wanda Pearce, Aaron Tabor and the Individual Danny Cryer" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Hearing titled "Motion for Hearing to Discuss Mediation for Settlement" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Charles M Conner, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exceptions to Eleventh Amendment Immunity, #2 Exhibit 2 - Threats of Violence Against Individuals, #3 Exhibit 3 - Section II-34, #4 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Supreme Court, #5 Exhibit 5 - Annotations, #6 Exhibit 6 - Annotations, #7 Exhibit 7 - Police Corruption, #8 Exhibit 8 - Gang stalking)(kmt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Return Case to the State of Oklahoma" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order titled "Motion for Jury Trial" by Charles M Conner, III. (kmt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hollis v. Creek Co., #2 Exhibit 2 - Shophar v. Bureau of Alcohol)(Ashlock, Justin)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin P Ashlock on behalf of Danny Cryer, Marshall County Oklahoma, Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners, Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma, Wanda Pearce (Ashlock, Justin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stefanie E Lawson on behalf of Jack Wallace Coppedge, Craig Ladd, Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics, Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Oklahoma State of, Aaron Tabor (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 17, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE civ-19-47-g Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2848630. (Lawson, Stefanie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2018-7063 filed by Oklahoma State of, Craig Ladd, Aaron Tabor, Attorney General of the State of Oklahoma, Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, Jack Wallace Coppedge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-12-21 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on ADA Tabor, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on City of Kingston OK, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on County of Marshall and Cryer individually, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on Court Clerk Pearce, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on Marshall County Sheriff, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on OAG, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on OBN, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2018-12-28 - Summons on OSBI, #11 Exhibit 11 - 2018-12-28- Summons on County of Marshall and MCBC, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2018-12-28- Summons on DA Ladd, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2018-12-28- Summons on Kingston Police, #14 Exhibit 14 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - Cryer, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - Ladd, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - Marshall County Sheriff, #17 Exhibit 17 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - MCBC, #18 Exhibit 18 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - OAG, #19 Exhibit 19 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - OBN(2), #20 Exhibit 20 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - OSBI, #21 Exhibit 21 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - Pearce, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2019-01-04 - Green Card - Tabor, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Oklahoma State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Kingston Oklahoma
Represented By: Randall J Wood
Represented By: Jessica L Dark
Represented By: Robert S Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County Sheriff's Department Oklahoma
Represented By: Justin P Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County Oklahoma Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Justin P Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Pearce
Represented By: Justin P Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kingston Police Department Oklahoma
Represented By: Randall J Wood
Represented By: Jessica L Dark
Represented By: Robert S Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall County Oklahoma
Represented By: Justin P Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Bureau of Narcotics
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Ladd
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wallace Coppedge
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Tabor
Represented By: Stefanie E Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Cryer
Represented By: Justin P Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M Conner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?