Brooks v. AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA

Plaintiff: Sheresa Brooks
Defendant: AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA
Case Number: 5:2019cv00056
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 @ 10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 3/25/2019. (cla)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA.(Smith, T)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA . (Smith, T)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Rand C Eddy on behalf of AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA (Eddy, R) Modified on 2/21/2019 to insert correct attorney name (nv).
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by T Matthew Smith on behalf of AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA (Smith, T)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheresa Brooks. AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA served on 1/29/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Sheresa Brooks (Haupt, Shannon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Sheresa Brooks (Leonard, Jana)
January 18, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2849490. (Leonard, Jana)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA. (nv)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA filed by Sheresa Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AR & OK Divisional HQ - TSA
Represented By: T Matthew Smith
Represented By: Rand C Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheresa Brooks
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?