Kirkwood v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Amy L Kirkwood
Defendant: Oklahoma State of and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv00077
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Join by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Narrative of David Hughes, #2 Envelope)(nv)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Narrative from Karen Hughes, #2 Envelope)(nv)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Join" by Stanley Dawidowicz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Join" by Karin Tang. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Join" by Vance Shadway. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oklahoma State of, United States of America filed by Amy L Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion for Order; denying as moot #19 Motion for Order. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/25/19. (jw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Pamela Molnar. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter from Pamela Molnar, #2 Envelope)(nv)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Mark Agro. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER; in light of the Court's Order of February 7, 2019, finding as moot #14 Motion for Order; finding as moot #15 Motion for Order; finding as moot #16 Motion for Order Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/19. (jw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Order titled Motion to Join. by Terry A Rosado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Handwritten Letter by Terry Rosado, #2 Envelope)(nv)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Order titled Motion to Join by Melissa J Bazzy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Order titled Motion to Join. by Rebecca S Pierson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Order. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/11/19. (jw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order "Motion to Join" by Jessica Nicole Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Amy L Kirkwood, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with federal pleading standards and cures the deficiencies noted above within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Should Plaintiff fail to file an amended complaint within this time, the Clerk shall dismiss the action without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/7/19. (jw)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #9 MOTION to Join and #10 MOTION to Join, STRICKEN due to failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). (nv)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Douglas W McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Gail F McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Rhonda T Favero. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Lawrence L Favero. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Join" by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma State of, United States of America. (nv)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/30/19. (mc)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amy L Kirkwood. (nv)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma State of, United States of America filed by Amy L Kirkwood. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Research Citation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkwood v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy L Kirkwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?