Lawton City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Lawton City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Anda Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Russell Portenoy, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Harvard Drug Group LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Abolghasem Rezaei, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Lynn Webster and Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00078
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 21, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY by Plaintiff Lawton City of re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lawton City of. (Court, Todd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Lawton City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTO, #2 Exhibit Statement of Interest, #3 Exhibit Withdrawal)(Campbell, Stuart)
March 14, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/12/19. (kmt)
March 6, 2019 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corporation Amended. (Huntsman, Susan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by The Harvard Drug Group LLC. (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 44 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Harvard Drug Group LLC . (Ray, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 43 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of The Harvard Drug Group LLC (Ray, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 42 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2019 Filing 41 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order 2, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order 1, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 21, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Lawton City of. (Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lawton City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Order - Trotter v. Smith et al.,, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel C Mathis on behalf of Abolghasem Rezaei (Mathis, Rachel)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Defendants Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc and Anda Inc Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Anda Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Petition within 45 days of the JPMLs final ruling on the motion to transfer. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/20/2019. (mb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Appearance. (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, or Otherwise Respond by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Hemphill, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Plead. Answer or Response due within 45 days of the JPML final ruling. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/11/2019. (mb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Docket, #2 Petition, #3 Return, #4 Entry, #5 Appearance, #6 Notice, #7 Entry, #8 Motion, #9 Entry, #10 Entry, #11 Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond within 45 days of the JPML's ruling on the motion to transfer. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
February 6, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Lamirand, Jennifer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ridgeway, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Burns, Joshua)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Coats, Sanford)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time , UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corporation (McBride, D)
January 29, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2854667. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Comanche County, case number CJ-2018-725 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - (Lawton) Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Returned - Rezaei, M.D, #5 Exhibit 5 - Entry of Appearance for Rezaei, M.D, #6 Exhibit 6 - Special Entry of App by Rezaei, M.D, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Bankruptcy by Rezaei, M.D, #8 Exhibit 8 - Entry of Appearance by McKesson Corp, #9 Exhibit 9 - Special Entry of App by McKesson, Cardinal and AmeriSourceBergen, #10 Exhibit 10 - Entry of Appearance for AmeriSourceBergen, #11 Exhibit 11 - Entry of Appearance by Cardinal Health, #12 Exhibit 12 - Docket Sheet Comanche County, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawton City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Lisa R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Harvard Drug Group LLC
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Represented By: Lisa R Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abolghasem Rezaei
Represented By: Rachel C Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawton City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?