Paxton v. United States Parcel Service Inc
Plaintiff: John C Paxton
Defendant: United States Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00098
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff John C Paxton. (Hammons, Mark)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint To Correct Name by John C Paxton. (Hammons, Mark)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer by John C Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Williams v. Encore Healthcare Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Alarcon v. Kirklands, Inc Order, #3 Exhibit 3- Gooch v. Hudiburg Order, #4 Exhibit 4- ADP Commer. Leasing, Inc. v. M.G. Santos, Inc, #5 Exhibit 5- Washington v. Integris Health, Inc, #6 Exhibit 6- Lucas v. Jerusalem Cafe, LLC, #7 Exhibit 7- Nixson v. Health Alliance, #8 Exhibit 8- Ulyssix Techs., Inc. v. Orbital Network Eng'g, Inc., #9 Exhibit 9- Topline Solutions, Inc. v. Sandler Sys.,, #10 Exhibit 10- Lane v. Page, #11 Exhibit 11- Knighten v. Allstate Ins. Co., #12 Exhibit 12- Wilson v. Lady Di Food Grps. Holding, LLC, #13 Exhibit 13- Telewizja Polska USA, Inc. v. EchoStar Satellite Corp, #14 Exhibit 14- LaSalle Bank Lake View v. Bridgman, #15 Exhibit 15- Shirazi v. Childtime Learning Ctr., #16 Exhibit 16- Unicredit Bank AG v. Bucheli, #17 Exhibit 17- Birabent v. Hudiburg Auto Group, Inc, #18 Exhibit 18- Gibson v. Officemax, Inc., #19 Exhibit 19- Woodard v. Chesapeake Energy Mktg, #20 Exhibit 20- Henson v. Supplemental Health Care Staffing Specialists, #21 Exhibit 21- United States v. Global Mortg. Funding, Inc.,)(Hammons, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of United States Parcel Service Inc (Ross, Paul)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties. (Schmoyer, Shannon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon B Schmoyer on behalf of United States Parcel Service Inc (Schmoyer, Shannon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Parcel Service Inc.(Schmoyer, Shannon)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 11:20 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 3/27/2019. (jb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of John C Paxton (Richards, Kristin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John C Paxton. United States Parcel Service Inc served on 2/6/2019. (Hammons, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of John C Paxton (Hammons, Mark)
February 4, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2857505. (Hammons, Mark)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Parcel Service Inc. (kmt)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Parcel Service Inc filed by John C Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton v. United States Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Parcel Service Inc
Represented By: Paul A Ross
Represented By: Shannon B Schmoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Paxton
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?