Jennings v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc

Plaintiff: Dale W Jennings
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00111
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 04/04/2019. (jb)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Dale W Jennings (Hammons, Mark)
March 26, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2890432. (Hammons, Mark)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (kmt) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/5/2019) (rb). Modified to correct attorney error in address 2/5/2019 (rb).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Halliburton Energy Services Inc filed by Dale W Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale W Jennings
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?