Eldridge v. Equifax Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Eldridge
Defendant: Summit Medical Center LLC, Kohl's Corporation, Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, Synchrony Bank, Equifax Inc, Ally Financial Inc, Cabelas Inc, Walmart Inc, Capital One Bank, Experian plc, Millennium Financial Group LLC, Sam's West Inc, Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC, First Premier Bank, Credit First National Association, TransUnion Incorporated, Merrick Bank Corporation and Comenity Capital Bank LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00115
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Equifax Inc . (Skinner, Maris)
March 18, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equifax Inc.(Skinner, Maris)
March 18, 2019 Filing 67 ENTRY of Appearance by Maris A Skinner on behalf of Equifax Inc (Skinner, Maris)
March 18, 2019 Filing 66 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur F Hoge, III on behalf of Equifax Inc (Hoge, Arthur)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, TransUnion Incorporated answer due 4/15/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/18/19. (jw)
March 15, 2019 Filing 64 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by TransUnion Incorporated . (Givens, Juston)
March 15, 2019 Filing 63 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Extension of Time to Resond to Plaintiff's Complaint) by TransUnion Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Order)(Givens, Juston)
March 15, 2019 Filing 62 ENTRY of Appearance by Juston R Givens on behalf of TransUnion Incorporated (Givens, Juston)
March 15, 2019 Filing 61 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry G Ball on behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation (Ball, Larry)
March 15, 2019 Filing 60 ENTRY of Appearance by Tami J Hines on behalf of Merrick Bank Corporation (Hines, Tami)
March 15, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Merrick Bank Corporation.(Hines, Tami)
March 14, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss by Kohl's Corporation. (Sherrill, Jennifer)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #32 First Premier Bank's Motion to Dismiss, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/13/19. (jw)
March 12, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Sam's West Inc, Walmart Inc, and Synchrony Bank by David Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv)
March 7, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Credit First National Association, Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, Comenity Capital Bank LLC and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by David Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 54 "Plaintiff's Riposte to First Premier Bank's Reply #44 in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Petition of Plaintiff" by Plaintiff David Eldridge re #44 Reply to Response to Motion filed by David Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Article titled S. Dakota Makes Itself a Banking Haven, #2 Attachment 2 - Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(nv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Cabela's Inc. by David Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(nv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE (other) by Synchrony Bank re Notice from the Court, #49 MOTION to Dismiss (Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant Synchrony Bank) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Federal Savings Associations)(Evans, Kristen)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #51 Notice (other), STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (nv)
March 6, 2019 Filing 51 STRICKENNOTICE (other) by Synchrony Bank re #50 Notice (other), #49 MOTION to Dismiss (Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant Synchrony Bank) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans, Kristen)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE from the Court #50 Notice (other), STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(A)(4)(a). (nv)
March 5, 2019 Filing 50 STRICKEN NOTICE (other) by Synchrony Bank re #49 MOTION to Dismiss (Request for Judicial Notice of Defendant Synchrony Bank) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Evans, Kristen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss by Synchrony Bank. (Evans, Kristen)
March 5, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss by Sam's West Inc, Walmart Inc. (Evans, Kristen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Experian plc.(Goodman, Jimmy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cabelas Inc . (Ellis, Isaac)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/26/19. (jw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition of Plaintiff David S. Eldridge and Brief in Support filed by First Premier Bank. (George, Lysbeth)
February 25, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE (other) by Cabelas Inc Consent To Removal (Ellis, Isaac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File A Responsive Pleading Out Of Time by Cabelas Inc. (Ellis, Isaac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 41 ENTRY of Appearance by Isaac R Ellis on behalf of Cabelas Inc (Ellis, Isaac)
February 19, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL as to Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, by David Eldridge. (nv)
February 19, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition of Plaintiff David S. Eldridge and Brief in Support filed by David Eldridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Page 6 of Transunion credit report)(nv)
February 19, 2019 Filing 38 ENTRY of Appearance by Curtis J Thomas on behalf of Summit Medical Center LLC (Thomas, Curtis)
February 14, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ally Financial Inc.(Sepkowitz, Jerome)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Carson K Glass on behalf of Sam's West Inc, Synchrony Bank, Walmart Inc (Glass, Carson)
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE (other) by Ally Financial Inc Consent to Removal (Sepkowitz, Jerome)
February 13, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ally Financial Inc . (Sepkowitz, Jerome)
February 13, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerome S Sepkowitz on behalf of Ally Financial Inc (Sepkowitz, Jerome)
February 13, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition of Plaintiff David S. Eldridge and Brief in Support by First Premier Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McClellon v. Wells Fargo Unpublished Case)(George, Lysbeth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Sam's West Inc . (Evans, Kristen)
February 13, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Walmart Inc . (Evans, Kristen)
February 13, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Synchrony Bank . (Evans, Kristen)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean B. Solis. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/19. (jw)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Response. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/19. (jw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean B. Solis Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2862890 by Experian plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission)(Goodman, Jimmy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Experian plc . (Goodman, Jimmy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE (other) by Experian plc of Consent to Removal (Goodman, Jimmy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Experian plc. (Goodman, Jimmy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Experian plc (Goodman, Jimmy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Millennium Financial Group LLC.(Cass, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE (other) by Millennium Financial Group LLC (Cass, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Millennium Financial Group LLC . (Cass, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G Cass on behalf of Millennium Financial Group LLC (Cass, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Sam's Club, Walmart, and Synchrony, Responses due by 3/5/2019. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/12/19. (jw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Bonnie K DelGobbo on behalf of Kohl's Corporation (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sam's West Inc, Synchrony Bank, Walmart Inc. (Evans, Kristen)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Kohl's Corporation answer due 3/15/2019.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/11/19. (jw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bonnie Keane DelGobbo. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/11/19. (jw)
February 8, 2019 Docket Annotation: Doc. #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice fee has been paid. Receipt No. 1087-2861281. (nv)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kohl's Corporation. (Sherrill, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kohl's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Sherrill, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by First Premier Bank . (George, Lysbeth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE (other) by Kohl's Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Cain, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren K Clifton on behalf of First Premier Bank (Clifton, Lauren)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Kohl's Corporation . (Cain, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lysbeth L George on behalf of First Premier Bank (George, Lysbeth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy D Cain on behalf of Kohl's Corporation (Cain, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer F Sherrill on behalf of Kohl's Corporation (Sherrill, Jennifer)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Consolidate; Given that Case No. CIV-19-115-R and Case No. CIV-19-119-R are the same removed case, they are hereby consolidated under the lower docket number (CIV-19-115-R). The clerk is directed to close Case No. CIV-19-119-R, and all future filings shall be made in Case No. CIV-19-115-R, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/8/19. (jw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristen P Evans on behalf of Sam's West Inc, Synchrony Bank, Walmart Inc (Evans, Kristen)
February 6, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2859784. (Evans, Kristen)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-1 filed by Sam's West Inc, Walmart Inc, Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eldridge v. Equifax Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Medical Center LLC
Represented By: Curtis J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Bonnie K DelGobbo
Represented By: Jennifer F Sherrill
Represented By: Timothy D Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Kristen P Evans
Represented By: Carson K Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc
Represented By: Maris A Skinner
Represented By: Arthur F Hoge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc
Represented By: Jerome S Sepkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabelas Inc
Represented By: Isaac R Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Kristen P Evans
Represented By: Carson K Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian plc
Represented By: Jimmy K Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Financial Group LLC
Represented By: Robert G Cass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West Inc
Represented By: Kristen P Evans
Represented By: Carson K Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Represented By: Lauren K Clifton
Represented By: Lysbeth L George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit First National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion Incorporated
Represented By: Juston R Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Bank Corporation
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: Larry G Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?