Petry v. Ecolab Inc

Plaintiff: Rodney L Petry
Defendant: Ecolab Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00116
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 10:40 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 4/24/2019. (jb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time and to Continue Status Conference. The status conference set in this matter for April 3, 2019 is CONTINUED to the Court's May 2019 status conference docket. The parties are ADVISED that their Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan will be due on or before Wednesday, April 24, 2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/20/2019. (jb)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Ecolab Inc.(Russell, Kyle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle B Russell on behalf of Ecolab Inc (Russell, Kyle)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Thirty (30) Days of Status Conference and Related Deadlines by Rodney L Petry. (Haupt, Shannon)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ecolab Inc answer due 3/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/06/2019. (jb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ecolab Inc. (Sisney, Amanda)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda SE Sisney on behalf of Ecolab Inc (Sisney, Amanda)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 10:40 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 3/27/2019. (jb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodney L Petry. Ecolab Inc served on 2/11/2019. (Leonard, Jana)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of Rodney L Petry (Haupt, Shannon)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of Rodney L Petry (Leonard, Jana)
February 8, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2861236. (Leonard, Jana)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ecolab Inc. (kmt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ecolab Inc filed by Rodney L Petry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petry v. Ecolab Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L Petry
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab Inc
Represented By: Kyle B Russell
Represented By: Amanda SE Sisney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?