Molden v. Joseph et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Molden, Jr
Defendant: Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc, Immanuel Properties LLC, Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc and Jain Joseph
Case Number: 5:2019cv00120
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc, Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc. (ank)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (llg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles T Battle on behalf of Nathaniel Molden, Jr (Battle, Charles)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Immanuel Properties LLC . (Reese, Jason)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Jain Joseph in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500072345 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (ac)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph.(Reese, Jason)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A Reese on behalf of Immanuel Properties LLC, Jain Joseph (Reese, Jason)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Stephen P. Friot for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/7/2019. (mb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2018-5818 filed by Jain Joseph, Immanuel Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance and Reservation of Time, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molden v. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Inn and Suites by Radisson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immanuel Properties LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D Buxton
Represented By: Jason A Reese
Represented By: David R Herber
Represented By: Ryan T Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Inn and Suites by Carlson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jain Joseph
Represented By: Jonathan D Buxton
Represented By: Jason A Reese
Represented By: David R Herber
Represented By: Ryan T Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Molden, Jr
Represented By: Charles T Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?