Haworth v. Select Rehabilitation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tammie L Haworth
Defendant: Select Rehabilitation, LLC and Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00126
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2019 11:40 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 4/24/2019. (jb)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue. The status conference set in this matter for April 3, 2019, is CONTINUED to the Court's May 2019 status conference docket. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/29/2019. (jb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST MOTION for Leave to Appear without Local Counsel by Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Jacobs, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Jacobs on behalf of Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC (Jacobs, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time of Status and Scheduling Conference by Tammie L Haworth. (Stockton, Joshua)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed on behalf of Defendants. Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC answer due 4/3/2019; Select Rehabilitation, LLC answer due 4/3/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed on behalf of Defendants by Tammie L Haworth. (Stockton, Joshua)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 11:00 AM in Room 3108 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 3/27/2019. (jb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammie L Haworth. Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC served on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt)(Stockton, Joshua)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tammie L Haworth. Select Rehabilitation, LLC served on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt)(Stockton, Joshua)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jaklyn F Garrett on behalf of Tammie L Haworth (Garrett, Jaklyn)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura R Talbert on behalf of Tammie L Haworth (Talbert, Laura)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua C Stockton on behalf of Tammie L Haworth (Stockton, Joshua)
February 7, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2860790. (Stockton, Joshua)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC, Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (kmt)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC, Select Rehabilitation, LLC filed by Tammie L Haworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haworth v. Select Rehabilitation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie L Haworth
Represented By: Laura R Talbert
Represented By: Joshua C Stockton
Represented By: Jaklyn F Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Rehabilitation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark of Midwest City Specialty Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?