Shepherd v. RSM Development Inc et al

Plaintiff: Susan Shepherd
Defendant: RSM Development Inc and Justin Small
Case Number: 5:2019cv00129
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Susan Shepherd. (Nice, R)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Justin Small. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Charge of Discrimination)(Dawkins, Grace)
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by RSM Development Inc . (Dawkins, Grace)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RSM Development Inc.(Dawkins, Grace)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Grace E Dawkins on behalf of RSM Development Inc, Justin Small (Dawkins, Grace)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca S Woodward on behalf of RSM Development Inc, Justin Small (Woodward, Rebecca)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Drew A Lagow on behalf of RSM Development Inc, Justin Small (Lagow, Drew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Shepherd. Justin Small served on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Green Card)(Nice, R)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Shepherd. RSM Development Inc served on 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Green Card)(Nice, R)
February 8, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2861312. (Nice, R)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to RSM Development Inc, Justin Small. (rb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RSM Development Inc, Justin Small filed by Susan Shepherd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepherd v. RSM Development Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Shepherd
Represented By: R Blaine Nice
Represented By: Kevin R Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSM Development Inc
Represented By: Drew A Lagow
Represented By: Grace E Dawkins
Represented By: Rebecca S Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Small
Represented By: Drew A Lagow
Represented By: Grace E Dawkins
Represented By: Rebecca S Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?