National Flooring Equipment Inc v. OEM Products Inc
Plaintiff: National Flooring Equipment Inc
Defendant: OEM Products Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00132
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY by Defendant OEM Products Inc to Plaintiff National Flooring, Inc.'s Reponse filed by OEM Products Inc. (McCarthy, Mitchell)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Sullivan, David)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by OEM Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(McCarthy, Mitchell)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Complaint Under Seal and Replace it with a Redacted Version. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/25/19. (kmt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Flooring Equipment Inc. OEM Products Inc served on 2/21/2019. (Watson, Tynia)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jorgen M Lervick on behalf of National Flooring Equipment Inc (Lervick, Jorgen)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by James T Nikolai, Sr on behalf of National Flooring Equipment Inc (Nikolai, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Complaint Under Seal and Replace it with a Redacted Version by OEM Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted complaint)(McCarthy, Mitchell)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to OEM Products Inc. (kmt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US Patent No. 6813834, #2 Exhibit B US Patent No. 7082686, #3 Exhibit C Patent Assignment Abstract of Title for Patent No. 6813834, #4 Exhibit D Patent Assignment Abstract of Title for Patent No. 7082686, #5 Exhibit E 11/15/12 Cease and Desist Letter, #6 Exhibit F 12/3/12 Letter, #7 Exhibit G 1/11/13 Letter, #8 Exhibit H OEM Invoice Packing Slip)(Watson, Tynia)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement its Complaint.Plaintiff shall file its supplemented Complaint on orbefore February 18, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/15/2019. (mb)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jorgen M Lervick. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/14/19. (kmt)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James T. Nikolai. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/14/2019. (mb)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Supplement Complaint by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Watson, Tynia)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Mitchell K McCarthy on behalf of OEM Products Inc (McCarthy, Mitchell)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2863097 by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Lervick)(Watson, Tynia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2863070 by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Nikolai)(Watson, Tynia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by National Flooring Equipment Inc . (Watson, Tynia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Tynia A Watson on behalf of National Flooring Equipment Inc (Watson, Tynia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by David M Sullivan on behalf of National Flooring Equipment Inc (Sullivan, David)
February 12, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2862790. (Watson, Tynia)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark (kmt)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OEM Products Inc filed by National Flooring Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2019: #2 Attachment Redacted Complaint) (kmt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Flooring Equipment Inc v. OEM Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OEM Products Inc
Represented By: Mitchell K McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Flooring Equipment Inc
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Represented By: David M Sullivan
Represented By: James T Nikolai, Sr
Represented By: Jorgen M Lervick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?