Porter v. Orange Leaf Holdings LLC

Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Defendant: Orange Leaf Holdings LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00142
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer E Jackson on behalf of Orange Leaf Holdings LLC (Jackson, Jennifer)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (llg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Orange Leaf Holdings LLC.(Zachritz, Anne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Orange Leaf Holdings LLC . (Zachritz, Anne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Orange Leaf Holdings LLC . (Zachritz, Anne)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Russell A Wantland on behalf of Orange Leaf Holdings LLC (Wantland, Russell)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Anne E Zachritz on behalf of Orange Leaf Holdings LLC (Zachritz, Anne)
February 14, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2864420. (Zachritz, Anne)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-19-00628 filed by Orange Leaf Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Leah Roper, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA Colby Addison, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Orange Leaf Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Leaf Holdings LLC
Represented By: Russell A Wantland
Represented By: Anne E Zachritz
Represented By: Jennifer E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?