Edmond City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Edmond City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, William Valuck, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Russell Portenoy, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Harvey Jenkins, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Anda Inc and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00149
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 4 JPML Transfer Order)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 22, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY by Plaintiff Edmond City of re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Edmond City of. (Court, Todd)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting defendant The Harvard Drug Group, LLC's #42 unopposed motion for extension of time; the referenced defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/19/2019. (lam)
March 18, 2019 Filing 42 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Harvard Drug Group LLC The. (Ray, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Edmond City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-82, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit 3 - Withdrawal of Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
March 15, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, O4rtho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s #35 unopposed motion for extension of time; the referenced defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to plaintiff's petition not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 3/8/2019. (cla)
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp Amended. (Huntsman, Susan)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Corporation's unopposed joint motion for extension of deadline...the referenced defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to plaintiff's petition not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/27/2019. (lam)
February 27, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed joint motion for extension of deadline...the referenced defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to plaintiff's petition not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/25/2019. (lam)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of deadline; the referenced defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's petition not later than 45 days following the later of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 02/25/2019. (lam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Motion for Extension)(Curran, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Edmond City of. (Court, Todd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Edmond City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 21, 2019 Docket Annotation: Please disregard Doc. #15 Unopposed Motion, due to erroneous filing. Counsel to re-file. (nv)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Motion, #5 Exhibit Entry, #6 Exhibit Entry, #7 Exhibit Order, #8 Exhibit Entry, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Exhibit Motion, #11 Exhibit Entry, #12 Exhibit Motion, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2866381. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2019-158 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Denial of Allegations by William Valuck DO, #5 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Ext of Time by McKesson, Cardinal Health and AmerisourceBergen, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA Campbell and Davis-Maddy for McKesson Corp, #7 Exhibit 7 - EOA McBride and Huntsman for AmerisourceBergen Corp, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order granting enlargement of time to McKesson et al, #9 Exhibit 9 - EOA Ryan Ray for Cardinal Health Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 - EOA Sparks and Ridgeway for Johnson & Johnson, Janssen defendants, #11 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Ext of Time by Manufacturer Defendants, #12 Exhibit 12 - EOA Riddles for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 - Mtn for Ext of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals, #14 Exhibit 14 - Order granting ext of time to Manufacturer Defendants, #15 Exhibit 15 - State Court Docket, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmond City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?