Ponca City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Ponca City City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Amerisourcebergen Corp, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Pharma Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Russell Portenoy, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis PLC, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Joshua Livingston, Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Lynn Webster, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, Anda Inc and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00160
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - April 4 JPML Transfer Order)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 46 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 45 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer N Lamirand on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Lamirand, Jennifer)
March 22, 2019 Filing 44 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Burns, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 43 REPLY by Plaintiff Ponca City City of re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ponca City City of. (Court, Todd)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/19/2019. (md)
March 18, 2019 Filing 41 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Harvard Drug Group LLC The. (Ray, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 40 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Ponca City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Order Regarding Remands [#130], #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Case Management Order [#232])(Court, Todd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-82, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statement of Interest of US, #3 Exhibit 3 - Withdrawal of Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
March 15, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/11/2019. (md)
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleadings by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 31 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp Amended. (Huntsman, Susan)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Petition within 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/28/2019. (md)
February 27, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wis. Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cal. Stay Order 1, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ky. Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cherokee Nation Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Delaware OK Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pawnee OK Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Osage OK Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - Portland ME Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - EDVA Stay Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - WDVA Stay Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Cal. Stay Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ill. Stay Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Fla. Deferral Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ariz. Partial Stay Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Anda, Inc. and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants are granted 45 days of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action, or (2) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this action, whichever is later. Motions terminated: #23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Anda Inc. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/25/2019. (md)
February 25, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Expedite Briefing filed by Amerisourcebergen Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Curran, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (McBride, D)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Briefing by Ponca City City of. (Court, Todd)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ponca City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Order - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Order - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12. The referenced defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiffs complaint not later than forty-five (45) days following the latter of the final determination of any motion to remand or transfer of this action to the MDL Panel. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/22/2019. (md)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE (other) by McKesson Corp Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Entry, #4 Exhibit Motion, #5 Exhibit Order, #6 Exhibit Entry, #7 Exhibit Motion, #8 Exhibit Entry, #9 Exhibit Motion, #10 Exhibit Order, #11 Exhibit Motion, #12 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
February 20, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2867175. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kay County, case number CJ-19-9 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet., #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to Purdue Pharma L.P, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons to The Purdue Frederick Co, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons to Cephalon Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Indutries Ltd, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 - Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons to Allergan PLC, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons to Actavis PLC, #18 Exhibit 18 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 - Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 - Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons to Actavis LLC, #23 Exhibit 23 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #24 Exhibit 24 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 - Summons to Insys Therapeutic Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 - Summons to McKesson Corp, #27 Exhibit 27 - Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #28 Exhibit 29 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #29 Exhibit 29 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 - Summons to Anda Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 - Summons to GCP Pharma LLC, #32 Exhibit 32 - Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 - Summons to Morris & Dickson Co Inc, #34 Exhibit 34 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 - Summons to The Harvard Drug Group LLC, #36 Exhibit 36 - Summons to Physicians Total Care Inc, #37 Exhibit 37 - Summons to Joshua J Livingston DO, #38 Exhibit 38 - Summons to Russell Portenoy MD, #39 Exhibit 39 - Summons to Perry Fine MD, #40 Exhibit 40 - Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #41 Exhibit 41 - Summons to William Valuck MD, #42 Exhibit 42 - Summons to Harvey Jenkins MD, #43 Exhibit 43 - EOA Campbell and Davis-Maddy for McKesson Corp, #44 Exhibit 44 - Motion for Ext of Time by McKesson, Cardinal Health and AmerisourceBergen Corp, #45 Exhibit 45 - Order granting extension of time, #46 Exhibit 46 - EOA McBride and Huntsman for AmerisourceBergen Corp, #47 Exhibit 47 - EOA Ryan Ray for Cardinal Health Inc, #48 Exhibit 48 - EOA Riddles for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #49 Exhibit 49 - Motion for Ext of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #50 Exhibit 50 - EOA Sparks and Ridgeway for Johnson & Johnson, Janssen defendants, #51 Exhibit 51 - Motion for Ext of Time by Manufacturer Defendants, #52 Exhibit 52 - Order granting Quest's motion for ext of time, #53 Exhibit 53 - Order granting Manufacturer Defendants' motion for ext of time, #54 Exhibit 54 - State court docket sheet, #55 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponca City City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corp
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Jennifer N Lamirand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Ashley E Quinn
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John H Sparks
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponca City City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?