Long v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Stephen W Long
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00177
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on Robert J. Troester, Acting United States Attorney, on 03/13/2019, filed by Plaintiff Stephen W Long. (McKnight, Marianna)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, on 03/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Stephen W Long. (McKnight, Marianna)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Stephen W Long. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 3/18/2019. (McKnight, Marianna)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER VACATING Report and Recommendation, denying as moot #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen W Long, #5 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen W Long. Plaintiff has paid his $400 filing fee. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/6/19. (lb)
March 5, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2876007. (McKnight, Marianna)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen W Long, #5 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen W Long. The undersigned recommends the court grant in part and deny in part Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs and supplemental motion. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/4/19. (lb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen W Long. (McKnight, Marianna)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Marianna E McKnight on behalf of Stephen W Long (McKnight, Marianna)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court orders Plaintiff to supplement his application on or before 3/19/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/26/19. (lb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen W Long. (kmt)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Stephen W Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen W Long
Represented By: Marianna E McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?