Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC v. Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Plaintiff: Prestige Oilfield Services LLC
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00181
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Patrick R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/19/2019. (mb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Harry S Jordan, IV on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Jordan, Harry)
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by John J Griffin, Jr on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Griffin, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 2:18-cv-01173.
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (bni) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiff's claims shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. (bni) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. re #5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Western District of Oklahoma filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. (Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Western District of Oklahoma filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC; 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Cloutier, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Cassels, Kelly)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Western District of Oklahoma filed by Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC. (Cassels, Kelly) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaim by Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC. Related document: #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),, Counterclaim, filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P..(Cassels, Kelly) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC (Cassels, Kelly) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC Notice of Agreed Extension of Time (Cassels, Kelly) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB042021 (meq)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Western District of Oklahoma by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent DVN Operating Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Devon OEI Operating, LLC for Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Debt Due, to Foreclose Oil and Gas Liens and Fraud, COUNTERCLAIM for Breaches of Contract against Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. from NM District - Lea County, case number D-506-CV-2018-01935. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cloutier, Andrew) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (mnb) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (mnb) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prestige Oilfield Services, LLC v. Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prestige Oilfield Services LLC
Represented By: Kelly Mack Cassels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Andrew J. Cloutier
Represented By: Ann C. Tripp
Represented By: John J Griffin, Jr
Represented By: Harry S Jordan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?