Mitchell v. Oklahoma Tax Commission
Plaintiff: Luann Mitchell
Defendant: Oklahoma Tax Commission
Case Number: 5:2019cv00183
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 5/28/2019. (jw)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Oklahoma Tax Commission.(Ray, Lauren)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Compliant. State Defendant is granted an extension of fourteen (14) days or until April 1, 2019 to file its responsive pleading in this matter. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 3/18/19. (jw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Dixie L Coffey on behalf of Oklahoma Tax Commission (Coffey, Dixie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren J Ray on behalf of Oklahoma Tax Commission (Ray, Lauren)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time by Oklahoma Tax Commission. (Ray, Lauren)
February 27, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2872011. (Taylor, Jeffery)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma Tax Commission. (nv)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Tax Commission filed by Luann Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Oklahoma Tax Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Tax Commission
Represented By: Dixie L Coffey
Represented By: Lauren J Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luann Mitchell
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?