Sartor v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc

Plaintiff: Denna Sartor
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00475
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Forrest L P DeVaughn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DeVaughn, Forrest)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:45 AM in Chambers before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. (md)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Kohl's Department Stores Inc.(Clark, Nathan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kayla R Petsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Petsch, Kayla)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs Demand for Jury Trial (Petsch, Kayla)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Kayla R Petsch on behalf of All Plaintiffs -- the form is blank. (Petsch, Kayla)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Denna Sartor in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500074280 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (rb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Clark, Nathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E Clark on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc (Clark, Nathan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2019-250 filed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit EOA, #4 Exhibit Delaware Secretary of State Listing for Kohl', #5 Exhibit Wisconsin Secretary of State Listing for Kohl's, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sartor v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denna Sartor
Represented By: Forrest L P DeVaughn
Represented By: Murry J Parrish
Represented By: Kayla R Petsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Represented By: Nathan E Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?