Kuykendall v. Leader Communications Inc
Plaintiff: Kari Kuykendall
Defendant: Leader Communications Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00480
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 09:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 8/7/2019. (llg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Leader Communications Inc.(Whatley, Nathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Kari Kuykendall (Addison, D)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kari Kuykendall. (Roper, Leah)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Kari Kuykendall (Roper, Leah)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Leader Communications Inc . (Whatley, Nathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Leader Communications Inc (Whatley, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Leader Communications Inc (Whatley, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2929762. (Whatley, Nathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-2408 filed by Leader Communitcations Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 OSCN Case Details, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuykendall v. Leader Communications Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Kuykendall
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leader Communications Inc
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?