Barron et al v. Daylight Petroleum LLC
Plaintiff: Sheila Barron and Eugene Barron
Defendant: Daylight Petroleum LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00537
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 04/15/2020; Jury instructions due 04/15/2020; Voir dire requests due 04/15/2020; Trial briefs due 04/15/2020; Discovery due by 2/1/2020. Jury Trial set on the court's 05/2020 trial docket before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 2/15/2020. Pretrial Report due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/31/2019. (lam)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER the 08/07/2019 status conference is STRICKEN...a scheduling order will be entered separately; initial disclosures shall be made not later than 08/05/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 07/31/2019. (lam)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Eugene Barron, Sheila Barron. (Johnston, Wes)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 08/07/2019 @ 10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Joe Heaton. Joint Status Report due by 07/29/2019. (lam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Daylight Petroleum LLC.(Matula, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Wes Johnston on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnston, Wes)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Daylight Petroleum LLC . (Matula, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R Matula on behalf of Daylight Petroleum LLC (Matula, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G Gum on behalf of Daylight Petroleum LLC (Gum, Robert)
June 12, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2940430. (Gum, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Caddo County District Court, case number CJ-2019-41 filed by Daylight Petroleum LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit 5 - Reservation of Time, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron et al v. Daylight Petroleum LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Barron
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Barron
Represented By: Wes Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daylight Petroleum LLC
Represented By: Robert G Gum
Represented By: Brian R Matula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?