Self v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Darryl Self
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00614
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Darryl Self. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 7/18/2019. (Mitzner, Miles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (nv)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 7/12/19. (mc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of Darryl Self (Mitzner, Miles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darryl Self. (nv)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Darryl Self. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Self
Represented By: Miles L Mitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?