Bowden v. Harper
Plaintiff: Cassidy Bowden
Defendant: Lauren Harper
Case Number: 5:2019cv00620
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days of this order; Motions to amend due within 14 days of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 1/6/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 1/20/2020; Pla witness list due 1/20/2020; Dft witness list due within 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 1/20/2020; Dft exhibit list due within 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 4/6/2020; Jury instructions due 4/6/2020; Voir dire requests due 4/6/2020; Trial briefs due 4/6/2020; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions due 4/6/2020; Discovery due by 3/6/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 2/6/2020. Pretrial Report due by 4/6/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/5/19. (kmt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Cassidy Bowden. (Bisher, Rick)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 9/3/2019. (mb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lauren Harper.(Lagow, Drew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Rick W Bisher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bisher, Rick)
July 10, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2955986. (Lagow, Drew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-3183 filed by Lauren Harper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - SPEOA, #4 Exhibit 4 - OSCN Case Details, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden v. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Harper
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Drew A Lagow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassidy Bowden
Represented By: Rick W Bisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?