Carr et al v. Harrison Gypsum LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Carr, Candice Carr, Phyllis Hobbs and Clayton Carr
Defendant: Arcosa Inc and Harrison Gypsum LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00633
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul D Kouri on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kouri, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan D Richter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richter, Nathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerald P Green on behalf of Arcosa Inc, Harrison Gypsum LLC (Green, Gerald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Arcosa Inc, Harrison Gypsum LLC.(Barahona, Marcus)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Harrison Gypsum LLC in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500075016 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (ac)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Arcosa Inc Consent to Removal (Barahona, Marcus)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Arcosa Inc. . (Barahona, Marcus) Modified on 7/15/2019 to correct filer (nv).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcus A Barahona on behalf of Arcosa Inc, Harrison Gypsum LLC (Barahona, Marcus)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Caddo County District Court, case number CJ-2019-53 filed by Harrison Gypsum LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Docket Report, #2 Exhibit 2 Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr et al v. Harrison Gypsum LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcosa Inc
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: Marcus A Barahona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Gypsum LLC
Represented By: Gerald P Green
Represented By: John C Lennon
Represented By: Marcus A Barahona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Carr
Represented By: Cody W Carr
Represented By: Paul D Kouri
Represented By: Nathan D Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candice Carr
Represented By: Cody W Carr
Represented By: Paul D Kouri
Represented By: Nathan D Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Hobbs
Represented By: Cody W Carr
Represented By: Paul D Kouri
Represented By: Nathan D Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Carr
Represented By: Cody W Carr
Represented By: Paul D Kouri
Represented By: Nathan D Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?