Turner v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Clayton Edward Turner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00663
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Edward Turner. (White, Timothy)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SECOND ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court, sua sponte, grants Plaintiff additional time tosubmit his application. Plaintiff shall submit an amended application curingthe deficiencies identified above on or before September 5, 2019. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 8/22/2019. (dwl)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by submitting an amended application on or before August 13, 2019. Plaintiff is advised thatfailure to comply with the Courts Order may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice to refiling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/23/2019. (dwl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Edward Turner. (nv)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Clayton Edward Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Fee Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Client Fee Acknowledgement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Edward Turner
Represented By: Richmond J Brownson
Represented By: Timothy M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?