Bowman v. Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dana Bowman
Defendant: Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC, Legacy Housing LLC and SRT-Landing LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00675
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint SRT-Landing LLC answer due 9/27/2019.. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 8/30/2019. (sr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SRT-Landing LLC. (Panach, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew S Panach on behalf of SRT-Landing LLC (Panach, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC.(Whatley, Nathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC . (Whatley, Nathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC (Whatley, Nathan)
July 25, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2965467. (Calhoun, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Legacy Housing LLC, Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC, SRT-Landing LLC. (ac)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Legacy Housing LLC, Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC, SRT-Landing LLC filed by Dana Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrimac Real Estate Holdings II LLC
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Housing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRT-Landing LLC
Represented By: Matthew S Panach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Bowman
Represented By: Brian M Dell
Represented By: Eric G Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?