Dobbs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bryan Dobbs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00688
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Dobbs. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 9/4/2019. (McKnight, Marianna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, on 09/05/2019, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Dobbs. (McKnight, Marianna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Non-Party for Summons and Complaint served on Robert J. Troester, Acting United States Attorney, on 09/03/2019, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Dobbs. (McKnight, Marianna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Marianna E McKnight on behalf of Bryan Dobbs (McKnight, Marianna)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (nv)
July 29, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2967049. (McKnight, Marianna)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Bryan Dobbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobbs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Dobbs
Represented By: Marianna E McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?