Ice v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Rex Daryl Ice
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00699
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (kmt)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is DENIED. Payment of the filing fee renders the R. & R.'s other recommendations moot. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/29/2019. (jb)
August 20, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2981305. (White, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- It is recommended that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ECF No. #2 be DENIED. It is further recommended that if Plaintiff does not pay the $400.00 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within twenty-one (21) days of any order adopting this Report and Recommendation, that this action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 7/31/19. (mc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rex Daryl Ice. (kmt)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Rex Daryl Ice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Fee Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Client Fee Acknowledgement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ice v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Daryl Ice
Represented By: Richmond J Brownson
Represented By: Timothy M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?