Board of County Commissioners of Grady County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Grady County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, MD William Valuck, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, MD Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, MD Lynn Webster, CVS Health Corporation, MD Harvey Jenkins, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc, MD Russell Portenoy and Anda Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00703
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Attorney Sanford Coats Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record. Attorney Sanford C Coats terminated. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/25/2019. (ks)
September 24, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford)
September 19, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 19, 2019 Filing 42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada OK Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole OK Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage OK Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee OK Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware OK Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit Wis. Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #10 Exhibit Ky. Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 County Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 County Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit Alameda CA Stay Order, #16 Exhibit Portland ME Stay Order, #17 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #18 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Ill. Stay Order, #21 Exhibit Fla. Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 19, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit Ohio Order on Kentucky's Motion to Remand)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy)(Burns, Joshua)
September 11, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Case List)(Zschiesche, Raymond)
September 9, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-District Court Order)(Curran, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Curran, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Curran, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Expedite by Board of County Commissioners of Grady County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Weber Cty. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., #2 Exhibit 2 - Uintah County Utah v Purdue Pharma LP, #3 Exhibit 3 - Randolph Remand Memo and Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dinwiddie - Memorandum Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5 - IPRF - Memorandum Opinion)(Court, Todd)
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand by Board of County Commissioners of Grady County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith et al., #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/23/2019. (ks)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 22, 2019 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford)
August 22, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford)
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford)
August 22, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/19/2019. (ks)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 and #20 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/16/2019. (ks)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move to Dismiss or Otherwise REspond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of McKesson Corp (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service (Jenkins), #5 Exhibit 5 - Denial of Plaintiff_s Allegations (Valuck), #6 Exhibit 6 - Return of Service (Portenoy), #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service (Valuck), #8 Exhibit 8 - Return of Service (Webster), #9 Exhibit 9 - Entry of Appearance (Quest), #10 Exhibit 10 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Return of Service (Actavis LLC), #12 Exhibit 12 - Return of Service (Actavis Pharma), #13 Exhibit 13 - Return of Service (Actavis PLC), #14 Exhibit 14 - Return of Service (Allergan), #15 Exhibit 15 - Return of Service (Anda Inc.), #16 Exhibit 16 - Return of Service (Cardinal), #17 Exhibit 17 - Return of Service (Cephalon), #18 Exhibit 18 - Return of Service (CVS Pharmacy), #19 Exhibit 19 - Return of Service (Endo Pharma), #20 Exhibit 20 - Return of Service (Janssen Pharm RA CT Corp Sys), #21 Exhibit 21 - Return of Service (Janssen Pharm RA CT Corp System), #22 Exhibit 22 - Return of Service (Johnson & Johnson), #23 Exhibit 23 - Return of Service (Keysource), #24 Exhibit 24 - Return of Service (McKesson), #25 Exhibit 25 - Return of Service (Morris & Dickson), #26 Exhibit 26 - Return of Service (OK CVS Pharmacy), #27 Exhibit 27 - Return of Service (Ortho-McNeil), #28 Exhibit 28 - Return of Service (Physicians Total Care-RA OK Sec St), #29 Exhibit 29 - Return of Service (Physicians Total), #30 Exhibit 30 - Return of Service (Purdua Pharma), #31 Exhibit 31 - Return of Service (Quest), #32 Exhibit 32 - Return of Service (Teva), #33 Exhibit 33 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots Alliance RA Corp Serv Co), #34 Exhibit 34 - Return of Service (Watson Pharma), #35 Exhibit 35 - Return of Service (Anda), #36 Exhibit 36 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt LLC), #37 Exhibit 37 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt PLC), #38 Exhibit 38 - Return of Service (Purdue Frederick), #39 Exhibit 39 - Return of Service (Purdue Pharma Inc.), #40 Exhibit 40 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots Alliance RA IL Corp), #41 Exhibit 41 - Return of Service (Watson Lab), #42 Exhibit 42 - Return of Service (Watson Pharm), #43 Exhibit 43 - Entry of Appearance (AmerisourceBergen), #44 Exhibit 44 - Entry of Appearance (McKesson), #45 Exhibit 45 - Unopposed Motion & Special Appearance (McKesson), #46 Exhibit 46 - CVS Special Appearance & Motion for Enlargement, #47 Exhibit 47 - Entry of Appearance (Cardinal), #48 Exhibit 48 - Order Granting CVS Motion for Enlargement, #49 Exhibit 49 - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement (McKesson), #50 Exhibit 50 - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #51 Exhibit 51 - Motion for Extension (MF Defendants), #52 Exhibit 52 - Order Granting Anda Defs Motion for Enlargment of Time to Answer, #53 Exhibit 53 - Order Granting MF Defs Motion for Ext of Time to Respond to Petition, #54 Exhibit 54 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargment of Time to Answer and Special Appearance (Anda Defs), #55 Exhibit 55 - Entry of Appearance (Anda Defs), #56 Exhibit 56 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 1, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2969661. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Grady County, case number CJ-2019-12 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 002 - State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 004 - Summons to Harvard Drug, #5 Exhibit 005 - Summons to Actavis Pharma, #6 Exhibit 006 - Summons to Actavis PLC, #7 Exhibit 007 - Summons to Allergan PLC, #8 Exhibit 008 - Summons to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #9 Exhibit 009 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #10 Exhibit 010 - Summons to Anda Inc, #11 Exhibit 011 - Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #12 Exhibit 012 - Summons to Cephalon Inc, #13 Exhibit 013 - Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #14 Exhibit 014 - Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #15 Exhibit 015 - Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #16 Exhibit 016 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals inc, #17 Exhibit 017 - Summons to GCP Pharma LLC, #18 Exhibit 018 - Summons to Harvey Jenkins MD, #19 Exhibit 019 - Summons to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #20 Exhibit 020 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #21 Exhibit 021 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 022 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #23 Exhibit 023 - Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 024 - Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #25 Exhibit 025 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #26 Exhibit 026 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #27 Exhibit 027 - Summons to McKesson Corporation, #28 Exhibit 028 - Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #29 Exhibit 029 - Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 030 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #31 Exhibit 031 - Summons to Perry Fine MD, #32 Exhibit 032 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -1, #33 Exhibit 033 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -2, #34 Exhibit 034 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -3, #35 Exhibit 035 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #36 Exhibit 036 - Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, #37 Exhibit 037 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #38 Exhibit 038 - Summons to Russell Portenoy MD, #39 Exhibit 039 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #40 Exhibit 040 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #41 Exhibit 041 - Summons to The Harvard Drug Group, #42 Exhibit 042 - Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company (1), #43 Exhibit 043 - Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #44 Exhibit 044 - Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #45 Exhibit 045 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #46 Exhibit 046 - Summons to William Valuck MD, #47 Exhibit 047 - Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -1, #48 Exhibit 048 - Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -2, #49 Exhibit 049 - Summons to Actavis LLC, #50 Exhibit 050 - Return of Service for Summons to Harvey Jenkins MD, #51 Exhibit 051 - Answer-Denial by William Valuck MD, #52 Exhibit 052 - Return of Service for Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #53 Exhibit 053 - Return of Service for Summons to Russell Portenoy MD, #54 Exhibit 054 - Return of Service for Summons to William Valuck MD, #55 Exhibit 055 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #56 Exhibit 056 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc), #57 Exhibit 057 - Return of Service for Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #58 Exhibit 058 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis Pharma, #59 Exhibit 059 - Return of Service for Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #60 Exhibit 060 - Return of Service for Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -1, #61 Exhibit 061 - Return of Service for Summons to Allergan PLC, #62 Exhibit 062 - Return of Service for Summons to Anda Inc, #63 Exhibit 063 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis PLC, #64 Exhibit 064 - Return of Service for Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals inc, #65 Exhibit 065 - Return of Service for Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #66 Exhibit 066 - Return of Service for Summons to McKesson Corporation, #67 Exhibit 067 - Return of Service for Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -2, #68 Exhibit 068 - Return of Service for Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #69 Exhibit 069 - Return of Service for Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, #70 Exhibit 070 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #71 Exhibit 071 - Return of Service for Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #72 Exhibit 072 - Return of Service for Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -3, #73 Exhibit 073 - Return of Service for Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #74 Exhibit 074 - Return of Service for Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #75 Exhibit 075 - Return of Service for Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #76 Exhibit 076 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis LLC, #77 Exhibit 077 - Return of Service for Summons to Cephalon Inc, #78 Exhibit 078 - Return of Service for Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #79 Exhibit 079 - Return of Service for Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #80 Exhibit 080 - Return of Service for Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #81 Exhibit 081 - Return of Service for Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #82 Exhibit 082 - Return of Service for Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #83 Exhibit 083 - Return of Service for Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #84 Exhibit 084 - Return of Service for Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #85 Exhibit 085 - Return of Service for Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company, #86 Exhibit 086 - Return of Service for Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -2, #87 Exhibit 087 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #88 Exhibit 088 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #89 Exhibit 089 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #90 Exhibit 090 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #91 Exhibit 091 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (McKesson Corp and AmerisourceBergen Drug), #92 Exhibit 092 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #93 Exhibit 093 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (CVS and Walgreens), #94 Exhibit 094 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (CVS and Walgreens), #95 Exhibit 095 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Manufacturer Defendants), #96 Exhibit 096 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party, #97 Exhibit 097 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc), #98 Exhibit 098 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Manufacturer Defendants), #99 Exhibit 099 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Anda), #100 Exhibit 100 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Anda), #101 Exhibit 101 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Anda, #102 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of Grady County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD William Valuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Kaylee P Davis-Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Harvey Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Russell Portenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of Grady County
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?