Marical v. Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC
Plaintiff: Jillian Marical
Defendant: Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00706
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 10:00 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (jw)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/9/2019. (md)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Scott L. Palk recused. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/9/2019. (md)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC.(Simpsen, Kristin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure of Members)(Simpsen, Kristin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by D Colby Addison on behalf of Jillian Marical (Addison, D)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jillian Marical. (Roper, Leah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Jillian Marical (Roper, Leah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin M Simpsen on behalf of Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC (Simpsen, Kristin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul A Ross on behalf of Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC (Ross, Paul)
August 1, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2969813. (Simpsen, Kristin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-3547 filed by Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 PETITION, #2 Exhibit 2 SUMMONS, #3 Exhibit 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCES, #4 Exhibit 4 OSCN CASE DETAILS, #5 Exhibit CIVIL COVER SHEET)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marical v. Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Heart Hospital LLC
Represented By: Kristin M Simpsen
Represented By: Paul A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Marical
Represented By: D Colby Addison
Represented By: Leah M Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?