Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Walgreen Co, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, MD Perry Fine, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Purdue Pharma Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, MD Lynn Webster, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Insys Therapeutic Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Watson Pharmaceutical Inc and Anda Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00730
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45755, filed 08/30/2019. (kmt)
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (Sharpe, G)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt)
August 28, 2019 Docket Annotation: Case electronically sent to the Northern District of Ohio. (kmt)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, #20 Defendant Quest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12, and #22 Defendants McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., The Harvard Drug Group, LLC, and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out) re #20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Courtesy Copy Received, #21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Motions terminated: #22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, McKesson Corp, #21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, #20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 8/22/2019. (ks)
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan H Way on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Way, Evan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company . (Coats, Sanford)
August 20, 2019 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford)
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP (Coats, Sanford)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Cardinal), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (Harvard), #6 Exhibit 6 - Appearance (McKesson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Unopposed Motion & Appearance (McKesson), #8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance (ABDC), #9 Exhibit 9 - Appearance (Quest), #10 Exhibit 10 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Unopposed Motion & Appearance (CVS), #12 Exhibit 12 - Order Granting Motion (McKesson), #13 Exhibit 13 - Appearance (Anda), #14 Exhibit 14 - Motion for Enlargement (Anda), #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Motion (Quest), #16 Exhibit 16 - Motion for Extension (MFs), #17 Exhibit 17 - Order Granting Motion (Anda), #18 Exhibit 18 - Order Granting Motion (CVS), #19 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #20 Exhibit 20 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kiowa County, case number CJ-19-9 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Service documents, #2 Exhibit 002 - State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #4 Exhibit 004 - Summons to Actavis LLC, #5 Exhibit 005 - Summons to Actavis PLC, #6 Exhibit 006 - Summons to Allergan PLC, #7 Exhibit 007 - Summons to Amerisource Bergen, #8 Exhibit 008 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals, #9 Exhibit 009 - Summons to Anda Inc, #10 Exhibit 010 - Summons to Walgreens, #11 Exhibit 011 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals, #12 Exhibit 012 - Summons to Watson Pharma, #13 Exhibit 013 - Summons to Watson Laboratories, #14 Exhibit 014 - Summons to Walgreens, #15 Exhibit 015 - Summons to Purdue Frederick, #16 Exhibit 016 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #17 Exhibit 017 - Summons to Quest, #18 Exhibit 018 - Summons to Purdue Pharma, #19 Exhibit 019 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, #20 Exhibit 020 - Summons to Perry Fine MD, #21 Exhibit 021 - Summons to McKesson, #22 Exhibit 022 - Summons to Cardinal Health, #23 Exhibit 023 - Summons to Oklahoma CVS, #24 Exhibit 024 - Summons to Cephalon, #25 Exhibit 025 - Summons to Harvard Drug, #26 Exhibit 026 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industires, #27 Exhibit 027 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, #28 Exhibit 028 - Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, #29 Exhibit 029 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen, #30 Exhibit 030 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #31 Exhibit 031 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #32 Exhibit 032 - Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #33 Exhibit 033 - Summons to Keysource Medical, #34 Exhibit 034 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica, #35 Exhibit 035 - Summons to Insys Therapeutics, #36 Exhibit 036 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #37 Exhibit 037 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #38 Exhibit 038 - Summons to Physicians Total Care, #39 Exhibit 039 - Summons to GCP Pharma, #40 Exhibit 040 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, #41 Exhibit 041 - Summons to Morris & Dickson, #42 Exhibit 042 - Summons to Endo Health, #43 Exhibit 043 - Summons to CVS Pharmacy, #44 Exhibit 044 - Summons to CVS Health, #45 Exhibit 045 - Petition, #46 Exhibit 046 - Entry of Appearance by McKesson, #47 Exhibit 047 - Unopposed Motion and Special Appearance by McKesson et al, #48 Exhibit 048 - Entry of Appearance by Cardinal, #49 Exhibit 049 - Entry of Appearance by Harvard, #50 Exhibit 050 - Entry of Appearance by Quest, #51 Exhibit 051 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #52 Exhibit 052 - Entry of Appearance by AmerisourceBergen, #53 Exhibit 053 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS, #54 Exhibit 054 - Order Granting McKesson's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #55 Exhibit 055 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, #56 Exhibit 056 - Entry of Appearance by Anda, #57 Exhibit 057 - Order Granting Quest's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #58 Exhibit 058 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Manufacturer Defendants, #59 Exhibit 059 - Order Granting CVS's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #60 Exhibit 060 - Order Granting Anda's Motion for Enlargement of Time, #61 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)
August 12, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2976062. (Zschiesche, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Perry Fine
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Joshua D Burns
Represented By: Sanford C Coats
Represented By: Evan H Way
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Lynn Webster
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutic Inc
Represented By: Amy J Pierce
Represented By: Joe M Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners for Kiowa County
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?