Campbell v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brandon Campbell
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00739
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Keith F Givens on behalf of Brandon Campbell (Givens, Keith)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by M Adam Engel on behalf of Brandon Campbell (Engel, M)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth G Cole on behalf of Brandon Campbell (Cole, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A Engel on behalf of Brandon Campbell (Engel, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven S Mansell on behalf of Brandon Campbell (Mansell, Steven)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 10:15 AM Room 3423 before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 10/25/2019. (jw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Kane, Matthew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company . (Kane, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE Regarding Removal. (Kane, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew C Kane on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Kane, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerard F Pignato on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company (Pignato, Gerard)
August 13, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2977159. (Pignato, Gerard)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2019-4098 filed by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Treasurer Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - CSAA Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - DA Recommendation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Drivers License Petition, #7 Exhibit 7 - Company Demographics, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gerard F Pignato
Represented By: Matthew C Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Campbell
Represented By: Mark A Engel
Represented By: Steven S Mansell
Represented By: M Adam Engel
Represented By: Kenneth G Cole
Represented By: Keith F Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?