Crowder v. Martin
Petitioner: Sharay Tyree Crowder
Respondent: Jimmy Martin
Case Number: 5:2019cv00747
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER petitioner, a state prisoner appearing pro se has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis...on 08/27/2019 the filing fee in this case was paid in full; accordingly the court strikes plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 as moot. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/08/2019. (lam)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION TO #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Sharay Tyree Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Copy of receipt received from OKWD, #2 Envelope)(nv)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 petitioner's motion for extension of deadline...petitioner shall file her objections to the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation #5 not later than October 9, 2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/29/2019. (lam)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Sharay Tyree Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DOC Request for Disbursement, #2 Envelope)(nv)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt for Money Received from Sharay Tyree Crowder in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500075816 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Balance for Petiton for Writ on Habeas Corpus paid in full. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : It is recommended that the motion for leave toproceed in forma pauperis re Doc. #2 be DENIED and the action bedismissed without prejudice unless Petitioner pays the full filing fee to the Clerk of the Clerk by September 9th, 2019. Objections to R&R due by 9/9/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 8/20/2019. (cps)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Joe Heaton on 08/15/19. (nv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (nv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharay Tyree Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sharay Tyree Crowder. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - CF-12-7719-Sentencing After Jury Trial, #2 Attachment 2 - CF-2012-1417 OK District Court Information with Affidavit, #3 Attachment 3 - Affidavit, #4 Attachment 4 - CF-2012-7719-OK District Court Information, #5 Attachment 5 - OK District County Court Affidavit and Application for Arrest Warrant, #6 Envelope)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowder v. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharay Tyree Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?