Walker v. Globe Life and Accident Insurance
Plaintiff: Shelly R Walker
Defendant: Globe Life and Accident Insurance
Case Number: 5:2019cv00750
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Shelly R Walker. (Hammons, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/17/19. (kmt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Shelly R Walker. (Hammons, Mark)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Martin J Lopez, III on behalf of Globe Life and Accident Insurance (Lopez, Martin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Candace W Lisle on behalf of Globe Life and Accident Insurance (Lisle, Candace)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn D Terry on behalf of Globe Life and Accident Insurance (Terry, Kathryn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Globe Life and Accident Insurance . (Terry, Kathryn)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Globe Life and Accident Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Arbitration Agreement)(Terry, Kathryn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shelly R Walker. Globe Life and Accident Insurance served on 8/19/2019. (Hammons, Mark)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kristin E Richards on behalf of Shelly R Walker (Richards, Kristin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Amber L Hurst on behalf of Shelly R Walker (Hurst, Amber)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark E Hammons on behalf of Shelly R Walker (Hammons, Mark)
August 16, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2979590. (Hammons, Mark)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Globe Life and Accident Insurance. (kmt)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Globe Life and Accident Insurance filed by Shelly R Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Globe Life and Accident Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly R Walker
Represented By: Mark E Hammons
Represented By: Kristin E Richards
Represented By: Amber L Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life and Accident Insurance
Represented By: Martin J Lopez, III
Represented By: Candace W Lisle
Represented By: Kathryn D Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?