United States of America v. Real Property Located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road Hohenwald TN 38462-5320
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road Hohenwald TN 38462-5320
Case Number: 5:2019cv00753
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SUMMONS Process Receipt and Return for Post and Walk for real property located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road, Hohenwald, TN 38462-5320 by United States of America (McGarry, Wilson)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE - NON SUMMONS Process Receipt and Return for Writ of Entry by United States of America (McGarry, Wilson)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 WRIT OF ENTRY. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 09/03/19. (wh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (McGarry, Wilson)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ of Entry by United States of America. (McGarry, Wilson)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable David L. Russell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/20/19. (jw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by United States of America (McGarry, Wilson)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Wilson D McGarry on behalf of United States of America (McGarry, Wilson)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Property Located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road Hohenwald TN 38462-5320 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Affidavit, #2 Attachment 2 - Verification - Larry Morgan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road Hohenwald TN 38462-5320
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 186 Homer Turnbow Road Hohenwald TN 38462-5320
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Wilson D McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?