Bauder v. Fudge et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Collins Bauder
Defendant: Delynn Fudge
Case Number: 5:2019cv00758
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT; In accordance with the Courts Order entered this date, Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/10/19. (jw)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #6 Report and Recommendation, This action is DISMISSED upon screening. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 10/10/19. (jw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 filed by Daniel Collins Bauder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crimes and Criminal Procedure OK.ST.57.Sect.332.7, #2 Exhibit B-Oklahoma Truth in Sentencing Act OK.St.57.Sect.332.7, #3 Exhibit C-Memorandum from Sherry Johnson dated 05.27.97, #4 Exhibit D-Order Denying Petition in Okla.County Court CF-95-3229, #5 Exhibit E - State of Oklahoma Certificate of Parole, #6 Envelope)(nv)
September 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- It is recommended that Mr. Bauder's Complaint be DISMISSED as time-barred. In the alternative, the case should be dismissed because Plaintiff has otherwise failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the District Judges referral in this matter. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 9/19/19. (mc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Daniel Collins Bauder in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500075804 regarding #1 Complaint. Balance for Complaint PAID IN FULL. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER -- Plaintiff has neither paid the filing fee in accordance with 1914 and LCvR3.2 nor submitted a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than September 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 8/21/19. (mc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Entered at the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 08/19/19. (nv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases. (nv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delynn Fudge(In her official capacity as Executive Director of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Delynn Fudge(in her individual capacity) filed by Daniel Collins Bauder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pardon and Parole Board, #2 Exhibit B - Investigative report, #3 Exhibit C - Investigative Report by D. Johnson, #4 Exhibit D - Investigative Report by R. Lawson, #5 Exhibit E - 57 O.S. Chapter 7, #6 Envelope)(nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauder v. Fudge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delynn Fudge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Collins Bauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?