JLL Consulting LLC v. Gaillardia Community Association Inc et al
Plaintiff: JLL Consulting LLC
Defendant: James Floyd Kyser, Gaillardia Community Association Inc, L Dickson Flake and Gaillardia Investors LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00762
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JLL Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ball, Larry)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JLL Consulting LLC answer due 10/16/2019.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/2/19. (kmt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 MOTION to Dismiss by JLL Consulting LLC. (Hines, Tami)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Gaillardia Community Association Inc . (Billings, A)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Gaillardia Community Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resignation Agreement)(Billings, A)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by A Wayne Billings on behalf of Gaillardia Community Association Inc (Billings, A)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by L Dickson Flake, Gaillardia Investors LLC, James Floyd Kyser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2010 Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 Amendment to Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2019 Revocation and Amended and Restated Declaration)(Krattiger, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Gaillardia Investors LLC . (Krattiger, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Krattiger on behalf of L Dickson Flake, Gaillardia Investors LLC, James Floyd Kyser (Krattiger, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of L Dickson Flake, Gaillardia Investors LLC, James Floyd Kyser (Merkley, Nicholas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLL Consulting LLC. Gaillardia Community Association Inc served on 9/4/2019. (Ball, Larry)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by JLL Consulting LLC (Ball, Larry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLL Consulting LLC. Gaillardia Investors LLC served on 8/27/2019. (Ball, Larry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLL Consulting LLC. James Floyd Kyser served on 8/27/2019. (Ball, Larry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JLL Consulting LLC. L Dickson Flake served on 8/27/2019. (Ball, Larry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to L Dickson Flake, Gaillardia Community Association Inc, Gaillardia Investors LLC, James Floyd Kyser. (kmt)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by JLL Consulting LLC . (Hines, Tami)
August 20, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2981408. (Hines, Tami)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L Dickson Flake, Gaillardia Community Association Inc, Gaillardia Investors LLC, James Floyd Kyser filed by JLL Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JLL Consulting LLC v. Gaillardia Community Association Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Floyd Kyser
Represented By: John M Krattiger
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaillardia Community Association Inc
Represented By: A Wayne Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Dickson Flake
Represented By: John M Krattiger
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaillardia Investors LLC
Represented By: John M Krattiger
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLL Consulting LLC
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: Larry G Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?