Brown Realty Investments LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brown Realty Investments LLC
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00783
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Brown Realty Investments LLC . (Williams, Justin)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 daus; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 3/6/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 3/20/2020; Pla witness list due 3/20/2020; Pla exhibit list due 3/20/2020; Motions in limine due 6/5/2020; Jury instructions due 6/5/2020; Voir dire requests due 6/5/2020; Discovery due by 5/6/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 4/6/2020. Pretrial Report due by 6/5/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/3/2019. (mb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Brown Realty Investments LLC. (Williams, Justin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph A Ziemianski on behalf of Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Ziemianski, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (mb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Stiner, John)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission of Joseph A. Ziemianski ProHac Vice . Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/30/19. (kmt)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2986197 by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Stiner, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company . (Stiner, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Stiner, John)
August 27, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2986004. (Stiner, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-4168 filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Summons and Service Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown Realty Investments LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: John D Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Realty Investments LLC
Represented By: Justin R Williams
Represented By: Weston O Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?