David v. Savage et al
Plaintiff: Jerome A. David
Defendant: Oklahoma State of, Edmond Police Department, Kathryn Savage, R Hill, Natalie Mai, Bill Foster, Rockie Yardley and Mason Long
Case Number: 5:2019cv00789
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard M Jones
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from Jerome A. David (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER from Jerome David (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Document 7 Order addressed to Warden, #2 Envelope) (rb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ~ On October 4, 2019, the Court received Plaintiff's letter, wherein he complains that his facility will not issue the payment until it receives an Order from the Court. #8 . Docketing notes indicate the Court mailed its Order to Plaintiff and Plaintiff's facility on September 19, 2019. However, in an abundance of caution, the Clerk of the Court shall re-send Plaintiff the Order, #7 , and he shall present it, with this Order, to prison officials. Plaintiff's deadline for payment is extended to October 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 10/8/2019. (dwl)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Jerome A. David (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ~ Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds Plaintiff is entitled to proceed without full prepayment of the filing fee, and his Application is granted. However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $12.52 which represents 20% of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiffs prison account(s) for the approximate six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding months income credited to his prison account(s) until he has paid the total fee of $350.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 9/19/2019. (dwl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerome A. David. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Letter from Jerome David, #2 Envelope)(rb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Jerome David (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ Plaintiff shall either pay the full $400.00 filing fee or apply for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, no later than September 19, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 8/29/2019. (dwl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Scott L. Palk on 8/28/19. (rb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (rb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jerome A. David. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Letter, #2 Envelope)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. Savage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmond Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Mai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockie Yardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome A. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?