Southwest Reinsure, Inc. et al v. Four Horsemen Auto Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Dealers Assurance Company and Southwest Reinsure Inc
Defendant: Four Horsemen Auto Group Inc, LB Holdings LLC, Chisholm Trail Real Estate LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, David Le Norman, Richard Horton, Chisholm Trail Auto Group II LLC, Michael E Deeba, Ty Hartwig, Chisholm Trail Auto Group, Randy Byford, Le Norman Properties LLC, Kent Gardner and Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00812
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re #120 Joint Notice of Pending Settlement. The court GRANTS the parties' request for stay. Any determination of #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 and #89 application for attorneys' fees is STAYED pending finalization of the parties' formal settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 10/16/2019. (llg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE (other) by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC Joint Notice of Pending Settlement (Hines, Tami)
October 4, 2019 Filing 119 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re #116 Order, Mail sent to Meredith Mathews (ac)
October 1, 2019 Filing 118 RESPONSE re #117 Notice (other) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpts from APP Doc 90, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from APP Doc 90, #3 Exhibit Libertas v. Cherryhill, #4 Exhibit Claudet v. First Federal)(Cassil, Larry)
October 1, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE (other) by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC of Intent to Pursue Rule 11 Motion (Hines, Tami)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by LB Holdings LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC. Said dfts are DIRECTED to file a written notice with the court by 10/1/2019 advising whether they wish to pursue their Rule 11 motion. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/13/2019. (llg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cassil, Larry)
September 13, 2019 Filing 114 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry G Cassil, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cassil, Larry)
September 12, 2019 Filing 113 ENTRY of Appearance by Jay P Walters on behalf of Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Walters, Jay)
September 12, 2019 Filing 112 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Merkley, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 111 ENTRY of Appearance by James M Reed on behalf of Randy Byford (Reed, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 110 ENTRY of Appearance by John T Richer on behalf of Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Richer, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 109 ENTRY of Appearance by A Wayne Billings on behalf of Michael E Deeba (Billings, A)
September 11, 2019 Filing 108 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan N B King on behalf of Michael E Deeba (King, Bryan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 107 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen J Moriarty on behalf of Michael E Deeba (Moriarty, Stephen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 106 ENTRY of Appearance by James M Reed on behalf of Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Reed, James)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. All in-state counsel, who wish to continue to represent a dft in this case, shall file entries of appearance as required by LCvR83.3(a) by 9/25/2019. One in-state counsel for each dft, in accordance with LCvR83.3(b) & LCvR83.2(g), shall then, by 10/2/2019, file pro hac vice motions on behalf of any out-of-state co-counsel who wish to continue as counsel for a dft in this case. After any out-of-state counsel have been admitted pro hac vice, they must immediately register for ECF & file their entries of appearance. Failure to comply with this order shall result in such action as this court may deem appropriate. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/11/2019. (llg)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting plfs until 9/25/2019 to have local counsel file entries of appearance as required by LCvR83.3(a). Local counsel, in accordance with LCvR83.3(b) & LCvR83.2(g), shall then, by 10/2/2019, file pro hac vice motions on behalf of any out-of-state counsel who wish to continue as counsel in this case. After any out-of-state counsel have been admitted pro hac vice, they must immediately register for ECF & file their entries of appearance. Failure to comply with this order shall result in such action as this court may deem appropriate. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 9/11/2019. (llg)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-01089. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #2 Attachment Memorandum Opinion and Order - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to dismiss to the extent venue in this District is improper. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motions as to dismissing this action for improper venue. In the interest of justice, the Court hereby transfers this case to the Western District of Oklahoma. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/3/2019) (aaa). Modified on 9/9/2019 (llg).
April 19, 2019 Filing 102 REPLY filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton re: #81 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 101 Appendix in Support filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re #100 Reply, (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 100 REPLY filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re: #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) for Want of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 99 Appendix in Support filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re #98 Reply, (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 98 REPLY filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re: #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #96 Unopposed Motion of Defendants Kent Gardner, Ty Harwig, and Richard Horton to Extend Time to File Reply. Replies due by 4/19/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/15/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #91 Response/Objection filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 95 REPLY filed by Michael E Deeba re: #76 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #93 Unopposed Motion to file Reply and Exceed Page Limit. Replies due by 4/19/2019, and the page limit is extended to 13 pages. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/9/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #89 Response/Objection filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) for Want of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #81 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 90 Appendix in Support filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re #89 Response/Objection (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 88 Appendix in Support filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re #87 Response/Objection (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 87 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #76 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #84 Motion to Exceed the Page Limitations. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' request to exceed the page limit but denies the requested enlargement. Plaintiffs may file a response not to exceed 35 pages. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/27/2019) (epm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re: #84 MOTION to Exceed the Page Limitations on its Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Exceed the Page Limitations on its Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re #79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and (3) for Want of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - Because the original Complaint is no longer the live pleading, the Court denies as moot the pending Motions to Dismiss the original Complaint (Doc. Nos. 19, 33, 44, & 54). The Le Norman Defendants, along with Defendant Randy Byford, filed a Supplement to their Dismissal Motions (Doc. No. 77) on March 7, 2019, as a timely response to the Amended Complaint. This supplemental filing expressly incorporates their previously filed motions to dismiss as well as their reply briefs (Doc. Nos. 19, 41, 54 & 64). In light of the Court's denial of these previous motions as moot, the Court grants the Le Norman Defendants and Defendant Randy Byford until Friday, March 15, 2019, to file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/13/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 80 Supplemental Document by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton as to #73 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement (Second Supplemental Certificate). (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua L Hedrick on behalf of Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hedrick, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 77 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Michael E Deeba with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southwest Reinsure Inc, Southampton Ltd, Dealers Assurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Court hereby STRIKES Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 71). If Plaintiffs wish to file an Amended Complaint that is in compliance with the Court's February 5, 2019 order, Plaintiffs must do so by 9:00pm, TODAY, February 26, 2019. Otherwise, the Court will dismiss this case without further notice for failure to comply with the Court's prior order. Any future instances such as this will immediately result in a show cause hearing requiring both Plaintiffs' counsel and the clients to appear, which may result in sanctions or any other remedy available to the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/26/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton. (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 71 ***STRICKEN per #74 ORDER*** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southwest Reinsure Inc, Southampton Ltd, Dealers Assurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Healey, Peyton) Modified on 2/26/2019 (ndt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 70 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael E Deeba. (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Ten (10) days from the date this order is signed. Each party's Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement must also properly reflect these parties' citizenship. Failure to comply with this order will result in a show cause hearing. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/5/2019) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 67 REPLY filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #65 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. Replies due by 12/12/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/3/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #62 Response/Objection filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jones, Christin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 64 REPLY filed by Randy Byford re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 61 REPLY filed by Michael E Deeba re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #59 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS KENT GARDNER, TY HARTWIG, AND RICHARD HORTONS MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFENDANT RANDY BYFORDS RULE 12(b)(3) and (4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR WANT OF PERSONAL JURISDICATION AND IMPRORER VENUE Responses due by 11/21/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/31/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by A Wayne Billings on behalf of Michael E Deeba. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan N B King on behalf of Michael E Deeba. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (King, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randy Byford. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 55 Appendix in Support filed by Randy Byford re #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Randy Byford with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen J Moriarty on behalf of Michael E Deeba. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moriarty, Stephen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 52 Appendix in Support filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re #51 Response/Objection To Defendant Michael E. Deeba, Trustee's Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan N B King. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/22/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of A Wayne Billings. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/22/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas V Merkley. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/22/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9529108) filed by Michael E Deeba (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Bryan N B King added to party Michael E Deeba(pty:dft) (King, Bryan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9528836) filed by Michael E Deeba (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney A Wayne Billings added to party Michael E Deeba(pty:dft) (Billings, A) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton. (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Nicholas Merkley (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9523006) filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nicholas V Merkley added to party Kent Gardner(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas V Merkley added to party Ty Hartwig(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas V Merkley added to party Richard Horton(pty:dft) (Merkley, Nicholas) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 42 Appendix in Support filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re #41 Reply, Supplemental Appendix (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #39 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Randy Byford shall file his answer or response to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than 10/24/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/4/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Randy Byford (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert K Wise added to party Randy Byford(pty:dft) (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #37 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, and Richard Horton shall file their answer or response to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than 10/17/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/4/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint filed by Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Christin Jeffrey Jones added to party Kent Gardner(pty:dft), Attorney Christin Jeffrey Jones added to party Ty Hartwig(pty:dft), Attorney Christin Jeffrey Jones added to party Richard Horton(pty:dft) (Jones, Christin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #35 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/15/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/3/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #31 Response/Objection filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 34 Appendix in Support filed by Michael E Deeba re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael E Deeba with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Brian W Clark added to party Michael E Deeba(pty:dft) (Clark, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 32 Appendix in Support filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re #31 Response/Objection To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael E Deeba; served on 9/14/2018. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Horton; served on 9/18/2018. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ty Hartwig; served on 9/14/2018. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kent Gardner; served on 9/18/2018. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Randy Byford; served on 9/19/2018. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Substitute Service of Process. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/11/2018) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/24/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/7/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time of Time to File Response filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc. (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION Substitute Service filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Proposed Order) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC. (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James M. Reed. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/9/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tami J. Hines. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/9/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC answer or response due 8/20/2018; Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC answer or response due 8/20/2018; LB Holdings LLC answer or response due 8/20/2018; David Le Norman answer or response due 8/20/2018; Le Norman Properties LLC answer or response due 8/20/2018. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/6/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9362564) filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice). Party DAVID LE NORMAN added.Attorney James M Reed added to party Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M Reed added to party Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M Reed added to party LB Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James M Reed added to party David Le Norman(pty:dft), Attorney James M Reed added to party Le Norman Properties LLC(pty:dft) (Reed, James) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney TAMI J HINES (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9357772) filed by Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert K Wise added to party Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert K Wise added to party Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert K Wise added to party LB Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert K Wise added to party David Le Norman(pty:dft), Attorney Robert K Wise added to party Le Norman Properties LLC(pty:dft) (Wise, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time For Service on Certain Defendants Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiffs shall have until September 24, 2018 to serve the defendants listed in their motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/26/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time For Service on Certain Defendants Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Diligence, #2 Exhibit(s) Sheriff's Affidavit, #3 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Diligence, #4 Exhibit(s) Sheriff's Affidavit, #5 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Diligence, #6 Exhibit(s) Sheriff's Affidavit, #7 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Diligence, #8 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Diligence, #9 Proposed Order) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service on Certain Defendants filed by Dealers Assurance Company, Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southampton Ltd, Southwest Reinsure Inc. Served as to Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, served on 7/13/2018; Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, served on 7/13/2018; LB Holdings LLC, served on 7/13/2018; David Le Norman, served on 7/13/2018; Le Norman Properties LLC, served on 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Healey, Peyton) Modified on 7/16/2018 to add name of defendants & dated served (zkc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 7 Proof of Service for Summons for Chisholm Trail Auto Group, LLC served on Roger Ely on 6/29/18. (Healey, Peyton) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 Proof of Service for Summons for Chisholm Trail Auto Group II, LLC served on Roger Ely on 6/29/18. (Healey, Peyton) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 Proof of Service for Summons for Chisholm Trail Real Estate, LLC served on Roger Ely on 6/29/18. (Healey, Peyton) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 4 Proof of Service for Summons for Four Horsemen Auto Group, Inc. served on Roger Ely on 6/29/18. (Healey, Peyton) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Randy Byford, Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC, Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC, Chisholm Trail Auto Group, Chisholm Trail Auto Group II LLC, Chisholm Trail Real Estate LLC, Michael E Deeba, Four Horsemen Auto Group Inc, Kent Gardner, Ty Hartwig, Richard Horton, LB Holdings LLC, David Le Norman, Le Norman Properties LLC. (mcrd/ala) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Helios Financial Holdings Corp, Southwest Reinsure Inc, Southampton Ltd, Dealers Assurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9153396) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G) (Healey, Peyton) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Reinsure, Inc. et al v. Four Horsemen Auto Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helios Financial Holdings Corp
Represented By: Mark L Taylor
Represented By: Peyton J Healey
Represented By: Joshua L Hedrick
Represented By: Larry G Cassil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southampton Ltd
Represented By: Meredith Mathews
Represented By: Mark L Taylor
Represented By: Peyton J Healey
Represented By: Joshua L Hedrick
Represented By: Larry G Cassil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dealers Assurance Company
Represented By: Meredith Mathews
Represented By: Mark L Taylor
Represented By: Peyton J Healey
Represented By: Joshua L Hedrick
Represented By: Larry G Cassil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Reinsure Inc
Represented By: Meredith Mathews
Represented By: Mark L Taylor
Represented By: Peyton J Healey
Represented By: Joshua L Hedrick
Represented By: Larry G Cassil, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Horsemen Auto Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LB Holdings LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Trail Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byford-Le Norman Duncan BCG LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Le Norman
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Horton
Represented By: Christin Jeffrey Jones
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Cole B Ramey
Represented By: Jay P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Trail Auto Group II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E Deeba
Represented By: John Joseph Kane
Represented By: Stephen J Moriarty
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Represented By: A Wayne Billings
Represented By: Brian W Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Hartwig
Represented By: Christin Jeffrey Jones
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Cole B Ramey
Represented By: Jay P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Trail Auto Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Byford
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Norman Properties LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Gardner
Represented By: Christin Jeffrey Jones
Represented By: Nicholas V Merkley
Represented By: Cole B Ramey
Represented By: Jay P Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byford-Le Norman Duncan CDJR LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Richer
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Tami J Hines
Represented By: James M Reed
Represented By: John T Richer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?