Kuhar v. Straehla et al
Plaintiff: Bryce Kuhar
Defendant: Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Arthur Amron, Matthew Ross, Marc McCarthy, Arty Straehla, James Palm, Paul Heerwagen and Arthur Smith
Case Number: 5:2019cv00817
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bryce Kuhar (Nespole, Gregory)
September 30, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT ENTRY: ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. (jb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendants Paul Heerwagen, Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Marc McCarthy, James Palm, Matthew Ross, Arthur Smith, Arty Straehla. Paul Heerwagen waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Mark Layton waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Mammoth Energy Services Inc waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Marc McCarthy waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; James Palm waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Matthew Ross waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Arthur Smith waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019; Arty Straehla waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Nespole, Gregory)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Charles Goodwin recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/13/2019. (jb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory M Nespole on behalf of Bryce Kuhar (Nespole, Gregory)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Nespole shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before September 23, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 09/09/2019. (jb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory M. Nespole Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2992039 by Bryce Kuhar. (Federman, William)
September 5, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2991476. (Federman, William)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Arthur Amron, Paul Heerwagen, Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Marc McCarthy, James Palm, Matthew Ross, Arthur Smith, Arty Straehla. (ank)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arthur Amron, Paul Heerwagen, Mark Layton, Mammoth Energy Services Inc, Marc McCarthy, James Palm, Matthew Ross, Arthur Smith, Arty Straehla filed by Bryce Kuhar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhar v. Straehla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mammoth Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Amron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arty Straehla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Palm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Heerwagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Kuhar
Represented By: William B Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?