Keener v. Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC
Plaintiff: Theresa Keener
Defendant: Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00826
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC . (Tran, Kim)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 DECEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 09:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 11/14/2019. (ks)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC.(Tran, Kim)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant Oklahoma Center for Orthopaedic & Multi-Specialty Surgery, LLC's Unopposed Motion for a Two-Week Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Answer due 10/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/27/19. (kmt)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC. (Tran, Kim)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kim A Tran on behalf of Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC (Tran, Kim)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel R Fulkerson on behalf of Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC (Fulkerson, Samuel)
September 6, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2992279. (Taylor, Jeffery)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC. (kmt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC filed by Theresa Keener. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keener v. Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Center for Orthopedic and Multi-specialty Surgery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Keener
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?