Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. Reynolds Ford Inc
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Defendant: Reynolds Ford Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00912
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/22/2019. (jb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Watson, Tynia)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Spencer F Smith on behalf of Reynolds Ford Inc (Smith, Spencer)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Reynolds Ford Inc. (Oubre, Zachary)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Reynolds Ford Inc . (Oubre, Zachary)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary A P Oubre on behalf of Reynolds Ford Inc (Oubre, Zachary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. Reynolds Ford Inc served on 10/2/2019. (Watson, Tynia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America . (Watson, Tynia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Tynia A Watson on behalf of Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America (Watson, Tynia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jimmy K Goodman on behalf of Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America (Goodman, Jimmy)
October 1, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3008602. (Watson, Tynia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE (other): AO-121 form mailed to Copyright Office. (ank)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Reynolds Ford Inc. (ank)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reynolds Ford Inc filed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Infringing Webpages, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. Reynolds Ford Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Represented By: Jimmy K Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Ford Inc
Represented By: Zachary A P Oubre
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?