Rodriquez v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Daisy Rodriquez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00914
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the August 2020 trial docket (8/11/2020 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/1/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 6/11/2020; Pla witness list due 6/1/2020; Dft witness list due 6/11/2020; Pla exhibit list due 6/1/2020; Dft exhibit list due 6/11/2020; Motions in limine due 7/23/2020; Jury instructions due 7/23/2020; Voir dire requests due 7/23/2020; Trial briefs due 7/23/2020; Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Motions due by 6/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 7/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/21/2019. (ks)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 DECEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 11/14/2019. (ks)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court)(Brewer, Michael)
October 5, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kari D Holder on behalf of Daisy Rodriquez (Holder, Kari)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
October 3, 2019 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3010067. (Brewer, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-2292 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA MB, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA JS, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriquez v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Rodriquez
Represented By: Mariano Acuna
Represented By: Kari D Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?