Allen v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Vera Allen
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2019cv00916
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY of Appearance by Margaret E Travis on behalf of Vera Allen (Travis, Margaret)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the July 2020 trial docket (7/14/2020 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 5/1/2020; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 5/11/2020; Pla witness list due 5/1/2020; Dft witness list due 5/11/2020; Pla exhibit list due 5/1/2020; Dft exhibit list due 5/11/2020; Motions in limine due 6/25/2020; Jury instructions due 6/25/2020; Voir dire requests due 6/25/2020; Trial briefs due 6/25/2020; Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Motions due by 5/1/2020. Pretrial Report due by 6/25/2020. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/21/2019. (ks)
November 21, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Casey R Lawson on behalf of Vera Allen (Lawson, Casey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Vera Allen. (Travis, Rex)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 the unopposed motion to withdraw as attorney for defendant. Attorney Thomas G Williams terminated. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/4/2019. (ks)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 DECEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:50 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 11/14/2019. (ks)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing defendant's counsel Thomas G. Williams to obtain local counsel, become admitted to the bar or be admitted pro hac vice and register for electronic case filing by October 31, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 10/17/2019. (ks)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel Jesse Gibson to become admitted to the bar or be admitted pro hac vice and register for electronic case filing by October 31, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 10/17/2019. (ks)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-05163.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Oklahoma. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 3, 2019. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Transfer by Vera Allen. (Travis, Rex) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case by Vera Allen. (Travis, Rex) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 **CORRECTED TIME** INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 11/13/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 26, 2019. (slc) Modified on 9/26/2019 (slc). [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Williams, Thomas) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vera Allen. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Travis, Rex) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rex Travis on behalf of Vera Allen. (Travis, Rex) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gibson, Jesse) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Rex Travis is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 26, 2019. (ee) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Rex Travis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1970072) by Vera Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Has Vice)(Gibson, Jesse) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1970062), filed by Vera Allen.(Gibson, Jesse) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Vera Allen. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) [Transferred from Arkansas Western on 10/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Allen
Represented By: Jesse Gibson
Represented By: Rex Travis
Represented By: Rex K Travis
Represented By: Casey R Lawson
Represented By: Margaret E Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Thomas G Williams
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?